This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2020 at 03:28:24 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS CYNTIA LUVIANO MALDONADO

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CYNTIA LUVIANO MALDONADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0421

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

LUVIANO MALDONADO CYNTIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2020

3/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/28/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTIA LUVIANO MALDONADO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/24/20; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTIA LUVIANO MALDONADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.