This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 18:57:48 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS CRYSTAL A. PASILLAS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRYSTAL A PASILLAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0430

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

PASILLAS CRYSTAL A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/12/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020

6/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

3/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/02/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • Hearing08/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/27/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/04/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal A. Pasillas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/19/20; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal A. Pasillas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal A. Pasillas (Defendant) to Crystal A. Pasillas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.