This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 01:48:58 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS AVELAR, CARLOS W.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2015 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AVELAR, CARLOS W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9034

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

809 N. Hacienda Blvd

La Puente, CA 91744

Defendant

AVELAR CARLOS W. AKA AVELAR CARLOS WILFREDO ANDRADES

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/18/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($40.00)

1/12/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($40.00)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/11/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - 'FAX' Confirmation (3 pages) of Sheriff bench warrant recall

2/6/2017: Other - (name extension) - 'FAX' Confirmation (3 pages) of Sheriff bench warrant recall

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/06/2017

2/6/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/06/2017

Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Hearing)

2/6/2017: Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Hearing)

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

9/13/2016: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 01/05/2017

1/5/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 01/05/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

1/5/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - signed by Nuvia Cervantes

6/9/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - signed by Nuvia Cervantes

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

8/15/2016: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/9/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/9/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Claudis Hernandez

10/25/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Claudis Hernandez

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/25/2016

10/25/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/25/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

10/25/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

4/10/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 04/10/2017

4/10/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 04/10/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/10/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Claudia Hernandez; Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketBench Warrant Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 02/06/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketOther - 'FAX' Confirmation (3 pages) of Sheriff bench warrant recall; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketBench Warrant Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) against Defendant (AVELAR, CARLOS W.) AKA (AVELAR, CARLOS WILFREDO ANDRADES) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC on 12/18/2015 (from ALH15G09034) for the principal amount of $840.33 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $930.33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) signed by Nuvia Cervantes; Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) . JANETTE ROQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 03:00P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. TONY L. RICHARDSON, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/09/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 . CONTINUED AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. . CLERK SHALL GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (AVELAR, CARLOS W.) AKA (AVELAR, CARLOS WILFREDO ANDRADES) BY SUB-SERVING JOSE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/11/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899032. HEARING SET FOR 03/11/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.