Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 12:41:17 (UTC).

DOMINIQUE LAPAGE VS LAUREN WOLF

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 DOMINIQUE LAPAGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAUREN WOLF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3073

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAPAGE DOMINIQUE

YANSEN SASHA

Defendant

WOLF LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LITTLE JAMES JEFFERY

SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

7/26/2019: Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/15/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Summons - on Complaint

10/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/13/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 10/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Reclassify; Filed by: Dominique LaPage (Plaintiff); Sasha Yansen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Dominique LaPage (Plaintiff); Sasha Yansen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08/27/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dominique LaPage (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Wolf (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dominique LaPage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC03073    Hearing Date: August 03, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO RECLASSIFY ACTION AS UNLIMITED CIVIL

RECLASSIFICATION

(CCP § 403.040)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiffs Dominique Lapage and Sasha Yansen’s Motion to Reclassify is GRANTED. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE RECLASSIFICATION/TRANSFER DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT OF THE CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFFS TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.ANALYSIS:

On October 13, 2017, Plaintiffs filed this action in limited civil for $10,000-$25,000. Plaintiffs’ counsel, James J. Little, passed away and Plaintiffs substituted in new counsel, Nathan H. Soleimani, on April 15, 2019.

On July 26, 2019, Plaintiffs filed the first Motion to Reclassify. Following a failure to demonstrate proper notice, the Court placed the First Motion to Reclassify off calendar on December 2, 2019. On December 6, 2020, Plaintiffs filed the second Motion to Reclassify, which is currently set for hearing on August 3, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedures section 403.040 allows a plaintiff to file a motion for reclassification of an action within the time allowed for that party to amend the initial pleading. (Code Civ. Proc., § 403.040, subd. (a).) If the motion is made after the time for the plaintiff to amend the pleading, the motion may only be granted if (1) the case is incorrectly classified; and (2) the plaintiff shows good cause for not seeking reclassification earlier. (Code Civ. Proc., § 403.040, subd. (b).) In Walker v. Superior Court (1991) 53 Cal.3d 257, 262, the California Supreme Court held that a matter may be reclassified from unlimited to limited only if it appears to a legal certainty that the plaintiff's damages will necessarily be less than $25,000. (Walker v. Superior Court (1991) 53 Cal.3d 257.) If there is a possibility that the damages will exceed $25,000.00, the case cannot be transferred to limited. (Ibid.) This high standard is appropriate in light of “the circumscribed procedures and recovery available in the limited civil courts.” (Ytuarte v. Superior Court (2005) 129 Cal.App.4th 266, 278.)

In Ytuarte, the Court of Appeals examined the principles it set forth in Walker and held that “the court should reject the plaintiff's effort to reclassify the action as unlimited only when the lack of jurisdiction as an “unlimited” case is certain and clear.” (Id. at 279.) Nevertheless, the plaintiff must present evidence to demonstrate a possibility that the damages will exceed $25,000.00 and the trial court must review the record to determine “whether a judgment in excess of $25,000.00 is obtainable.” (Ibid.)

Discussion

Here, because the initial time for Plaintiffs to amend the pleadings has passed, Plaintiffs must show that the case is incorrectly classified, and that it had good cause for not moving to reclassify earlier. The Court concludes Plaintiffs have satisfied this burden based on the circumstances that Plaintiffs’ former counsel had passed away and Plaintiffs’ new counsel determined there was a possibility that damages would exceed $25,000. (Motion, Solemani Decl., ¶¶2-8.)

Plaintiffs present sufficient evidence to demonstrate a possibility that the damages will exceed $25,000.00. Plaintiffs have incurred approximately $18,581.70 in medical expenses to date in this case. (Soleimani Decl. ¶ 5, Exh. A; LaPage Decl.) Further, LaPage has lost wages in the amount of $2,400 based on the incident. (Soleimani Decl. ¶ 5.) Lastly, Yansen seeks damages for severe emotional distress. (Compl. ¶ 11(g).) Even if the jury determines Yansen is entitled to damages for his emotional distress in the amount of only $5,000 for seeing his mother become injured in a vehicle collision, this would exceed the $25,000 threshold. Based on the foregoing, a judgment in excess $25,000.00 is obtainable.

Accordingly, the Court concludes Plaintiffs have satisfied their burden, and the motion for reclassification is GRANTED. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE RECLASSIFICATION/TRANSFER DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT OF THE CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFFS TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 17STLC03073    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 94

Dominique LaPage, et al. v. Lauren Wolf, et al

RECLASSIFICATION

(CCP § 403.040)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Unless Plaintiffs Dominique Lapage and Sasha Yansen file a proof of service prior to the hearing demonstrating proper notice of the October 23, 2019 order and the December 2, 2019 hearing date, the Motion to Reclassify is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

Background

On October 13, 2017, Plaintiffs filed this action in limited civil for $10,000-$25,000. Plaintiffs’ counsel, James J. Little, passed away and Plaintiffs substituted in new counsel, Nathan H. Soleimani, on April 15, 2019.

On July 26, 2019, Plaintiffs filed this motion. It is unopposed.

Procedure

At the initial hearing on October 23, 2019, the Court noted that Plaintiffs failed to file a proof of service with the motion. “Proof of service of the moving papers must be filed no later than five court days before the time appointed for the hearing.” (CRC, Rule 3.1300(c).) As a result, the Court continued the hearing to December 2, 2019 to allow Plaintiffs to file a proper proof of service. The Court also ordered Plaintiffs to give notice of the order.

On the same date, Plaintiffs filed a proof of service of the Motion to Reclassify. However, no proof of service has been filed regarding the Court’s October 23, 2019 order. Therefore, Plaintiff has not demonstrated that Defendant was given notice of the prior order or the new hearing date.

Unless Plaintiffs file a proof of service prior to the hearing demonstrating proper notice of the October 23, 2019 order and the December 2, 2019 hearing date, the Motion to Reclassify is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LITTLE JAMES J. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.