Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2018 at 12:32:39 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS ULOMA ABAI ROBERSON

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ULOMA ABAI ROBERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5396

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd,

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

ROBERSON ULOMA ABAI

San Pedro, CA 90731

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Civil Settlement Agreement

1/4/2018: Civil Settlement Agreement

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 01/04/2018

1/4/2018: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 01/04/2018

(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

1/4/2018: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/2/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/2/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

11/2/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Unknown

10/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/12/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

RESET FROM COURTROOM

9/12/2017: RESET FROM COURTROOM

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Other - Civil Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); Uloma Abai Roberson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 01/04/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 01/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 01/04/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the written civil settlement agreement signed and filed this date, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 07/17/2017, judgment entered on 11/02/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 07/17/2017, judgment entered on 11/02/2017 as to Uloma Abai Roberson is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Uloma Abai Roberson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) RESET FROM COURTROOM; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Uloma Abai Roberson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant