This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 10:03:10 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS TRACEY MONIQUE GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRACEY MONIQUE GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1975

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

GUTIERREZ TRACEY MONIQUE

Wilmington, CA 90744

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

10/3/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Minute Order of 09/29/2016

9/29/2016: Minute Order of 09/29/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/29/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/6/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

12/6/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Writ of Execution - (los angeles)

2/3/2017: Writ of Execution - (los angeles)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

2/3/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/13/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/6/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 12/06/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/6/2016: Minute Order of 12/06/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/6/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/3/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

8/3/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/3/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/3/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 12/06/2016 to 07/18/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Tracey Monique Gutierrez (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Writ of Execution (los angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: los angeles; Principal: 2,470.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0009274 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/06/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 12/06/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Tracey Monique Gutierrez (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160803E0627 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160803E0627 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Tracey Monique Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.