This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:44:51 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS RICARDO VARGAS

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICARDO VARGAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0205

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

VARGAS RICARDO

Inglewood, CA 90301

 

Court Documents

Order on Request for Court Order

11/15/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

11/20/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

9/29/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

11/18/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/2/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/2/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request for Court Order and Answer

10/25/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 11/16/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/16/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 11/16/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/2/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment

10/25/2017: Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

11/18/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - (Court Order (Non-Appearance))

11/16/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order (Non-Appearance))

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

10/6/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/29/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/29/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/22/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 11/16/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 11/18/2016, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dollar Loan Center California, LLC against Defendant Ricardo Vargas on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $1,600.00 for a total of $1,600.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ricardo Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment, Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160607E0997 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160607E0997 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less