This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:43:49 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS MACHELL MCCLENDON POWELL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MACHELL MCCLENDON POWELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0210

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

POWELL MACHELL MCCLENDON

Los Angeles, CA 90043

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/5/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/05/2016

8/5/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/05/2016

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/5/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/12/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/5/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 08/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/05/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/05/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Machell McClendon Powell (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160607E1011 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160607E1011 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Machell McClendon Powell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less