This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 09:04:38 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS JASON DEAN BILL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2016 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JASON DEAN BILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1308

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

BILL JASON DEAN

Torrance, CA 90501

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/16/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

3/21/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/13/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

7/13/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/13/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/13/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

9/13/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order of 09/13/2016

9/13/2016: Minute Order of 09/13/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/13/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment

10/19/2016: Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment

Request for Court Order and Answer

10/19/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order

12/12/2016: Order on Request for Court Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/13/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Court Order)

12/13/2016: Minute Order - (Court Order)

[Order on Request for Court Order]

12/13/2016: [Order on Request for Court Order]

Unknown

7/28/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/12/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

[Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment, Request for Court Order and Answer]

11/3/2016: [Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment, Request for Court Order and Answer]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010971 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 1,335.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Dismissal entered on 09/13/2016, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jason Dean Bill (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160714E2700 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160714E2700 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jason Dean Bill (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.