Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2017 at 10:08:51 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS BRITTNEY DENISE YOUNG

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRITTNEY DENISE YOUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5266

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd,

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

YOUNG BRITTNEY DENISE

Los Angeles, CA 90043

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017

9/12/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/12/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

7/28/2017: Unknown

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/12/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brittney Denise Young (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/20/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170714E0829 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170714E0829 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brittney Denise Young (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant