This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 14:13:28 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS ANDREA MICHELLE REESE

Case Summary

On 07/29/2016 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDREA MICHELLE REESE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1920

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

Defendant

REESE ANDREA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/25/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 10/25/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/25/2016: Minute Order of 10/25/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Desiree Lerma

10/25/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Desiree Lerma

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/29/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/29/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

7/29/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/29/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

[Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

11/4/2016: [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/2/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

10/31/2016: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

12/9/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Minute Order of 12/09/2016

12/9/2016: Minute Order of 12/09/2016

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

12/9/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - By Olga Martinez

12/9/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - By Olga Martinez

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/4/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Withdrawn - Filed in Error; Result Date: 12/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/09/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 12/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 12/09/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2016; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 07/29/2016, judgment entered on 10/25/2016 is vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 07/29/2016, judgment entered on 10/25/2016 as to Andrea Michelle Reese is vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Olga Martinez; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Desiree Lerma; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Michelle Reese (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160808E8932 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160808E8932 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/25/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Michelle Reese (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant