This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:40:43 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC VS ALAN RUDRICK

Case Summary

On 06/13/2016 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALAN RUDRICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0461

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC

8860 W Sunset Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

RUDRICK ALAN

Torrance, CA 90504

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9/30/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/16/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/13/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/13/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/13/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/13/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/16/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/16/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/16/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/16/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/16/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/26/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • Writ - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2,655.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0004781 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dollar Loan Center California, LLC against Defendant Alan Rudrick on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 06/13/2016 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $2,655.00.; Other: Default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alan Rudrick (Defendant); Service Cost: 105.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160614E5100 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160614E5100 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alan Rudrick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.