This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 02:00:08 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC C/O DLC EMPIRE VS ELIZABETH MICHELE BURIANEK

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA, LLC C/O DLC EMPIRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELIZABETH MICHELE BURIANEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3958

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTER CALIFORNIA LLC C/O DLC EMPIRE

8860 W Sunset Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant

BURIANEK ELIZABETH MICHELE AKA ELIZABETH M BURIANEK AKA LIZ M BURIANEK

Buena Park, CA 90620

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/20/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3/20/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/12/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

3/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/22/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/22/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/22/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/22/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

9/25/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

9/25/2018: Notice of Postponement

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

8/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Michele Burianek (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 340.00; Service Date: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2,360.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire against Defendant Elizabeth Michele Burianek AKA Elizabeth M Burianek, AKA Liz M Burianek on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire on 08/10/2018 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $200.00 for a total of $2,700.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/22/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/22/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Michele Burianek (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/04/18; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC C/O DLC Empire (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Michele Burianek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less