This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 18:59:21 (UTC).

DMITRY GUZIK VS MARIO MIRANDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DMITRY GUZIK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIO MIRANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1167

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUZIK DMITRY

Defendants

MIRANDA MARIO

BERNAL DEYSI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDVER ALINA

Defendant Attorney

ALLEGUEZ TINA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/12/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/12/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/15/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/18/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Hearing06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Dmitry Guzik (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dmitry Guzik on 12/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dmitry Guzik as to Deysi Bernal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dmitry Guzik on 12/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dmitry Guzik as to Deysi Bernal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/29/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Deysi Bernal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dmitry Guzik (Plaintiff); As to: Deysi Bernal (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dmitry Guzik (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Miranda (Defendant); Service Cost: 104.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dmitry Guzik (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Miranda (Defendant); Deysi Bernal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dmitry Guzik (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Miranda (Defendant); Deysi Bernal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dmitry Guzik (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Miranda (Defendant); Deysi Bernal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11167    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 25

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.41)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Daysi Dolores Bernal’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of June 23, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of June 23, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On December 5, 2019, Plaintiff Dmitry Guzik (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, negligence, contract rescission, restitution, money had and received, and damage to real property against Defendants Mario Miranda (“Miranda”) and Deysi Bernal (“Bernal”) (collectively, “Defendants”).

On March 18, 2020, Defendant Bernal filed the instant Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint (the “Demurrer”). No opposition was filed.

On June 12, 2020, Plaintiff filed a request to dismiss the complaint with prejudice as to Defendant Bernal only. On June 15, 2020, dismissal was entered as requested.

Accordingly, Defendant Bernal’s Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Daysi Dolores Bernal’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.