This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 02:10:45 (UTC).

DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC VS AMERICAN APPAREL LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN APPAREL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0676

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES LLC DBA CORE STAFFING SOLUTIONS

Defendant

AMERICAN APPAREL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEACH CHERYL S.

SANDS THOMAS D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Association of Counsel

7/15/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Association of Counsel

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

1/14/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Association of Counsel: Name Extension changed from Notice of Association of Counsel to of Association of Counsel; As To Parties changed from AMERICAN APPAREL LLC (Defendant) to DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN APPAREL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC on 11/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAddress for cheryl S. beach (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAddress for Thomas D Sands (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN APPAREL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN APPAREL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN APPAREL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIVERSIFIED EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN APPAREL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less