This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 05:32:35 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SANDY Y RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDY Y RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3515

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ SANDY Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONG BORA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of Non Service

10/6/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of Non Service

Complaint - Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: SANDY Y RODRIGUEZ (Defendant); Service Date: 10/07/2020; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Of Non Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: SANDY Y RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: SANDY Y RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: SANDY Y RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less