Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:11:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ROQUE, PATRICIA V

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROQUE, PATRICIA V. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3459

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ROQUE PATRICIA V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL - VLACHOS, MICHAEL

Attorney at CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

VLACHOS MICHAEL ESQ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/23/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/1/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS

3/1/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - WAIVE INTEREST

3/1/2018: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - WAIVE INTEREST

Declaration (name extension) - RE: BRIEF SUMMARY

3/1/2018: Declaration (name extension) - RE: BRIEF SUMMARY

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/1/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/1/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

3/1/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Default Judgment

3/7/2018: Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/7/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (DISCOVER BANK) against Defendant (ROQUE, PATRICIA V) on the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 07/12/2017 for the principal amount of $3,904.94 and costs of $294.00 for a total of $4,198.94.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 294.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 07/12/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: BRIEF SUMMARY; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration WAIVE INTEREST; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA V ROQUE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to PATRICIA V ROQUE; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA V ROQUE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/26/2017; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853036. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VLACHOS MICHAEL GEORGE