This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 05:22:40 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ROBERT L REED

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT L REED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1224

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

REED ROBERT L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN CARINA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Fee Waiver Hearing) of 08/12/2020

8/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Fee Waiver Hearing) of 08/12/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Fee Waiver Hearing)

8/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Fee Waiver Hearing)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Fee Waiver hearing Date.)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Fee Waiver hearing Date.)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Fee Waiver hearing Date.) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Fee Waiver hearing Date.) of 06/17/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/7/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/07/2020

4/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/07/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Fee Waiver Hearing)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Fee Waiver Hearing)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Fee Waiver Hearing) of 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Fee Waiver Hearing) of 03/20/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/19/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

General Denial - General Denial

2/19/2020: General Denial - General Denial

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/20/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

2/25/2020: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - Notice on Hearing About Court Fees

3/6/2020: Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - Notice on Hearing About Court Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/8/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • Hearing01/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Fee Waiver Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Fee Waiver Hearing) of 08/12/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 08/12/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Fee Waiver hearing Date.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Fee Waiver hearing Date.) of 06/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Fee Waiver Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/12/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 01/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT L REED (Defendant); Service Date: 01/14/2020; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT L REED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT L REED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT L REED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20NWLC01224    Hearing Date: March 20, 2020    Dept: SEA

On the fee waiver request, 20NWLC1224, the court has read and considered the request. The request to make payments on the filing fee is granted. Defendant is allowed to make monthly payments in the minimum amount of $25.00 per month until fully paid.

Clerk to give notice.