Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:24:18 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS LUCERO G LOPEZ DE MOLAND

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUCERO G LOPEZ DE MOLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9834

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LOPEZ DE MOLAND LUCERO G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TANG JASON W.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

3/8/2018: Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

2/20/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration of Mailing

12/7/2017: Declaration of Mailing

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/7/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration (name extension) - In Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest

2/20/2018: Declaration (name extension) - In Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Of Non-Military Service

2/20/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Of Non-Military Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Discover Bank against Defendant Lucero G Lopez De Moland on the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 11/13/2017 for the principal amount of $2,784.54 and costs of $294.50 for a total of $3,079.04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lucero G Lopez De Moland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Default entered as to Lucero G Lopez De Moland; On the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Declaration Of Non-Military Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Declaration In Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lucero G Lopez De Moland (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/05/2017; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lucero G Lopez De Moland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lucero G Lopez De Moland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less