Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 23:14:55 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HOVERDER, WILLIAM W

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOVERDER, WILLIAM W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7619

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HOVERDER WILLIAM W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL - VLACHOS, MICHAEL

Attorney at CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

RUIZ ABRIL FIONA

VLACHOS MICHAEL ESQ

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Due Diligence

9/13/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER

12/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER

Declaration (name extension) - RE: MEMO OF COSTS

12/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: MEMO OF COSTS

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/14/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - RE: SUMMARY OF THE CASE

12/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: SUMMARY OF THE CASE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS

12/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

12/14/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

12/14/2017: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/14/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Association of Attorney

12/14/2017: Association of Attorney

Default Judgment

12/19/2017: Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/19/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/28/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SAN DIEGO)

3/1/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SAN DIEGO)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SAN DIEGO); Issued by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM W HOVERDER (Defendant); County: SAN DIEGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM W HOVERDER (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 465.62; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketAddress for MICHAEL VLACHOS, ESQ (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (DISCOVER BANK) against Defendant (HOVERDER, WILLIAM W) on the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 04/18/2017 for the principal amount of $3,816.95 and costs of $363.00 for a total of $4,179.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to WILLIAM W HOVERDER; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Abril Fiona Ruiz (Attorney); As to: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketAddress for MICHAEL VLACHOS, ESQ (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM W HOVERDER (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2017; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM W HOVERDER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 04/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853067. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VLACHOS MICHAEL GEORGE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruiz, Abril