This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 01:06:40 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERYL M. BEASLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8805

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SHERYL M. BEASLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ANUGWOM HENRIETTA N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BABAIANS BIANCA

Defendant Attorney

HARUTYUNYAN SHAHANE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

4/1/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF COUNSEL RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

4/1/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF COUNSEL RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Court Trial Date)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Court Trial Date)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/23/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF COUNSEL RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

11/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF COUNSEL RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

11/23/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial

12/1/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial date.) of 06/10/2020

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial date.) of 06/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Matter is not called for a hearing.)

4/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order - Matter is not called for a hearing.)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Matter is not called for a hearing.) of 04/08/2020

4/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Matter is not called for a hearing.) of 04/08/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/26/2020

3/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/26/2020

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/19/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/9/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

10/15/2019: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 05/23/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL: Filed By: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Court Trial Date)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Court Trial Date scheduled for 04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 04/15/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09/08/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM (Defendant); Service Date: 06/13/2019; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Sheryl M. Beasley in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HENRIETTA N ANUGWOM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19NWLC18805    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: A

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL: GRANTED

The Court Trial is advanced and continued to APRIL 29, 2021 at 8:30 a.m., in Department A.

Moving party shall give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARUTYUNYAN SHAHANE