Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:39:51 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS DOLORES J HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOLORES J HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3003

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HERNANDEZ DOLORES J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN CARINA M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOLORES J HERNANDEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/26/2021; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOLORES J HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOLORES J HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOLORES J HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan, Carina M