This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2020 at 01:34:21 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CYNTHIA TANOUYE

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYNTHIA TANOUYE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7498

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

TANOUYE CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE JANE

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Trial

10/28/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Trial

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/23/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

11/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF COUNSEL RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

11/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF COUNSEL RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

11/23/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/23/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)

11/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial

12/1/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 06/17/2020

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Trial

6/17/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Trial

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/10/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

9/10/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

7/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • Hearing02/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA TANOUYE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL: Filed By: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department G updated: Result Date to 11/25/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/25/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEx-parte Reset - Court Unavailable, Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/25/2020 08:30 AM at Department G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA TANOUYE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA TANOUYE (Defendant); Service Date: 08/12/2019; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA TANOUYE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA TANOUYE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA TANOUYE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19NWLC27498    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: A

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL: GRANTED

The Court Trial is advanced and continued to FEBRUARY 25, 2021 at 8:30 a.m., in Department A.

Moving party shall give notice.