This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 02:42:09 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CRUZ, LILIAN

Case Summary

On 10/16/2012 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRUZ, LILIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5413

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

CRUZ LILIA

RODRIGUEZ SANTOS

CRUZ LILIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBEL P S

OSTERMAN, PETER R.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAAK OLESK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2015
  • RETURNED MAIL OF CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • NOTICE OF REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/01/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DECLARATION OF PLNTF IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY AT TRIAL CCP 98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2012
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • CMR SET 04/19/13, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less