This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 11:29:24 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. CHEUNG, SANDY P

Case Summary

On 09/10/2014 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHEUNG, SANDY P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1026

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CHEUNG SANDY P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTA L. WHITE & ASSOCIATES, P.S. - PETER R. OSTERMAN

SUTTELL,HAMMER & WHITE, APC - PETER R. OSTERMAN

Attorney at SUTTELL,HAMMER & WHITE, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON03/16/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ASTO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED ASTO (CHEUNG, SANDY P) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY BENNY C.OSORIO TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FORFAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTPURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARINGON 09/11/17 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNCHA487303020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Osterman, Peter R