Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:52:55 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ANTOINETTE J CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTOINETTE J CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2977

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER ANTOINETTE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBOURN THOMAS J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 12/28/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by DISCOVER BANK as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANTOINETTE J CHRISTOPHER (Defendant); Service Date: 01/20/2021; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANTOINETTE J CHRISTOPHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANTOINETTE J CHRISTOPHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANTOINETTE J CHRISTOPHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sebourn, Thomas J.