This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 09:49:19 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC. VS AMERICAN DRESSER PRODUCTIONS NY, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against AMERICAN DRESSER PRODUCTIONS NY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3569

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC.

Respondent

AMERICAN DRESSER PRODUCTIONS NY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

4/22/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/11/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Judgment - Judgment Proposed

4/8/2021: Judgment - Judgment Proposed

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 03/04/2021

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 03/04/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

11/25/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/29/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

10/29/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/29/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketJudgment Proposed; Signed and Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc. against Respondent American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. on the Petition filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. on 10/29/2020 for the principal amount of $6,171.17 for a total of $6,171.17.; Other: Interest at the rate of ten percent (10%) per year shall accrue on all unpaid amounts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Proposed Judgment scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Petition to Confirm an Arbitration Award scheduled for 05/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Proposed Judgment scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 03/04/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/04/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: American Dresser Productions NY, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM MICHELLE