This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 10:51:33 (UTC).

DIMITRIY FELDMAN VS CARPETZOOM, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 DIMITRIY FELDMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARPETZOOM, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5667

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELDMAN DIMITRIY AKA DAVID FELDMAN

Defendants

CARPETZOOM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LYUBLINER MICHAEL

KRASHENNY IGOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVODOR ALAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/6/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/1/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/1/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

10/1/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dimitriy Feldman on 07/06/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dimitriy Feldman as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Lyubliner (Defendant); Igor Krashenny (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Michael Lyubliner; Igor Krashenny; On the Complaint filed by Dimitriy Feldman on 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Lyubliner (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/08/2020; Service Cost: 131.70; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Igor Krashenny (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/08/2020; Service Cost: 68.70; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Carpetzoom, a California corporation (Defendant); Michael Lyubliner (Defendant); Igor Krashenny (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Carpetzoom, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Carpetzoom, a California corporation; On the Complaint filed by Dimitriy Feldman on 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Carpetzoom, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/10/2020; Service Cost: 66.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Carpetzoom, a California corporation (Defendant); Michael Lyubliner (Defendant); Igor Krashenny (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dimitriy Feldman (Plaintiff); As to: Carpetzoom, a California corporation (Defendant); Michael Lyubliner (Defendant); Igor Krashenny (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVODOR ALAN