This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2020 at 07:31:00 (UTC).

DIESEL MACHINE WORKS LLC VS CHRIS DARLING

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 DIESEL MACHINE WORKS LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CHRIS DARLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4671

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIESEL MACHINE WORKS LLC

Respondent

DARLING CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LAU BENSON

SATNICK ADAM

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/10/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/1/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/1/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel)

6/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) of 06/09/2020

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) of 06/09/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)]

2/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/18/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Petition (name extension) - Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration

10/24/2019: Petition (name extension) - Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration

Summons - Summons on Petition

10/24/2019: Summons - Summons on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Kelly Miller in support of Verified Petition

10/24/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Kelly Miller in support of Verified Petition

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/24/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/24/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Ar...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration scheduled for 07/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/13/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 07/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner); As to: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 07/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) of 06/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Benson Lau (Attorney); Adam Satnick (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner); As to: Chris Darling (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Kelly Miller in support of Verified Petition; Filed by: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner); As to: Chris Darling (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner); As to: Chris Darling (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner); As to: Chris Darling (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketPetition Verified Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration; Filed by: Diesel Machine Works LLC (Petitioner); As to: Chris Darling (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP04671    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP §§ 1281.2)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Diesel Machine Works, LLC’s Petition to Compel Arbitration is CONTINUED to APRIL 30, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

At least 16 days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On October 24, 2019, Petitioner Diesel Works, LLC (“Petitioner”) initiated this action with a Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration (“Petition”) against Respondent Chris Darling (“Respondent”).

To date, no opposition or reply briefs have been filed.

  1. Service of the Petition

Petitioner filed a proof of service stating that Respondent was served with the Summons and Petition pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, section 1290.4, subdivision (b) and attaches copies of certified mail receipts. (11/18/19 Proof of Service.) However, Section 1290.4 provides the manner of service for petitions related to the enforcement of an arbitration award, and is thus inapplicable here.

Accordingly, Petitioner is ordered to file an amended proof of service demonstrating it properly served Respondent with the Summons and Petition in accordance with Code of Civil Procedure section 415.10, et seq.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Diesel Machine Works, LLC’s Petition to Compel Arbitration is CONTINUED to APRIL 30, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

At least 16 days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.