This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 01:23:53 (UTC).

DIAZ, FELIPE VS JOHNSON, RANDAL GLEN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 DIAZ, FELIPE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNSON, RANDAL GLEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN COULSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0424

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAWN COULSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ FELIPE

Defendant

JOHNSON RANDAL GLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketOrder case file destroyed per section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketNOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (JOHNSON, RANDAL GLEN) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketPROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER A.M. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. DAWN COULSON, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/04/16 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JOHNSON, RANDAL GLEN) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC524099004. HEARING SET FOR 02/04/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less