This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2020 at 01:00:08 (UTC).

DIANA SMITH, ET AL. VS SUSAN MICHELLE BECK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 DIANA SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUSAN MICHELLE BECK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2677

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH KYESHIA

SMITH DIANA

Defendants

BECK SUSAN MICHELLE

BECK BRADLEY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN JOSEPH DAVID

Defendant Attorney

MCGARRY JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

6/11/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

6/11/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

6/11/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 09/10/2020

9/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 09/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

6/11/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

6/11/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

6/11/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/8/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

4/9/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

4/9/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Khloe Smith a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith

10/24/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Khloe Smith a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Kywun Casey a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith

10/24/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Kywun Casey a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Destiny Speaker a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith

10/24/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Destiny Speaker a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/4/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

10/10/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: Filed By: Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: Filed By: Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 09/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 09/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/10/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 09/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Advanced and Heard on 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 09/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Advanced and Heard on 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 09/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Signed and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDestiny Speaker a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith; Signed and Filed by: Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Destiny Spearker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketKywun Casey a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith; Signed and Filed by: Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Kywun Casey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketKhloe Smith a minor, by and through guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith; Signed and Filed by: Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Khloe Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Diana Smith (Plaintiff); Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); Kywun Casey (Plaintiff); Khloe Smith (Plaintiff); Destiny Spearker (Plaintiff); As to: Susan Michelle Beck (Defendant); Bradley L. Beck (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diana Smith (Plaintiff); Kyeshia Smith (Plaintiff); Kywun Casey (Plaintiff); Khloe Smith (Plaintiff); Destiny Spearker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC12677    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 26

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Kyeshia Smith to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim on behalf of minor Plaintiff Kywun Casey is GRANTED.

On October 10, 2018, Plaintiffs Diana Smith, Kyeshia Smith, and minor Plaintiffs Kywun Casey, Khloe Smith and Destiny Speaker, by and through their guardian ad litem Kyeshia Smith, filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Susan Michelle Beck and Bradley L. Beck (“Defendants”). On October 24, 2018, the Court granted Kyeshia Smith’s (hereinafter “Petitioner”) application to be appointed the Minor Plaintiffs’ guardian ad litem.

Petitioner filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Kywun Casey on June 11, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc., § 372.) “[A] minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, . . . shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (CCP § 372, emphasis added.)

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds it is complete and provides for a reasonable settlements to minor Plaintiff Kywun Casey based the injuries sustained and future prognosis. Proposed orders have been filed concurrently. Therefore, the Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Disputed Claim is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.