Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2019 at 04:44:13 (UTC).

DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, A NONPROFIT MUTUAL-BENEFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, A NONPROFIT MUTUAL-BENEFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4231

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION A NONPROFIT MUTUAL-BENEFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

COPP CONTRACTING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CITY OF DIAMOND BAR A PUBLIC ENTITY

CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF DIAMOND BAR A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREINER ALISON M.

Defendant Attorneys

GLADYCH JOHN

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/29/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Satisfaction

9/4/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Satisfaction

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

8/26/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/22/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/16/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

7/9/2019: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

7/19/2019: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

7/19/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

7/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/17/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/30/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/30/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Satisfaction; Filed by: CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); As to: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation on 04/30/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation as to CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity, CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation, and COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); As to: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 401.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity on 07/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity as to COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant), DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff), COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) to CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant), COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/10/2019; Service Cost: 63.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff); Service Date: 05/10/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity (Defendant); COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity (Defendant); COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIAMOND RIDGE ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, a nonprofit mutual-benefit California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF DIAMOND BAR, a public entity (Defendant); COPP CONTRACTING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant