This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 05:00:24 (UTC).

DERSARKISSIAN ARIN VS PATRICK ZOHRABIAN

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 DERSARKISSIAN ARIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PATRICK ZOHRABIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8677

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIN DERSARKISSIAN

Defendant

ZOHRABIAN PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LALAZARIAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/2/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/18/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAddress for David Lalazarian (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dersarkissian Arin on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dersarkissian Arin as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Dersarkissian Arin (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Zohrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Dersarkissian Arin (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Zohrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Patrick Zohrabian; On the Complaint filed by Dersarkissian Arin on 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Dersarkissian Arin (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Zohrabian (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dersarkissian Arin (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Zohrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dersarkissian Arin (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Zohrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dersarkissian Arin (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Zohrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LALAZARIAN DAVID