This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 00:08:03 (UTC).

DEREON L MARTIN VS FCA US, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 DEREON L MARTIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1306

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN DEREON L

Defendants

BILLION AUTO GROUP

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELLER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ROUBINIAN LEON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/31/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

2/3/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/5/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/11/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Billion Auto Group (Defendant), FCA US, LLC (Defendant) to Billion Auto Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dereon L Martin on 12/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Dereon L Martin as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAddress for Michael Geller (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Dereon L Martin on 12/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Dereon L Martin as to Billion Auto Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Billion Auto Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); As to: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff); As to: Billion Auto Group (Defendant); Service Date: 12/13/2019; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Billion Auto Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Billion Auto Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Billion Auto Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dereon L Martin (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Billion Auto Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5 STAR AUTO GROUP DBA BILLION AUTO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant