Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 08:42:31 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS ROYA HASHIMIAMREE

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROYA HASHIMIAMREE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6417

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

HASHIMIAMREE ROYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALET KERI L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/9/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roya Hashimiamree (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roya Hashimiamree (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roya Hashimiamree (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALET KERI L