This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2019 at 08:06:12 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2705

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

Defendant

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGANELLI CARL SHADI

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/24/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

6/24/2019: Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Filing Of Petition For Relief

9/24/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Filing Of Petition For Relief

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Filing Of Petition For Relief; Filed by: WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in ROOM 118 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Department of Industrial Relations (Plaintiff); As to: WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: Department of Industrial Relations (Plaintiff); As to: WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Department of Industrial Relations against Defendant WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. on the Petition filed by Department of Industrial Relations on 06/24/2019 for the principal amount of $8,344.00, interest of $614.94, and costs of $225.00 for a total of $9,183.94.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less