This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 17:42:10 (UTC).

DEON EVINS VS AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 DEON EVINS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WESLEY L. HSU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2438

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WESLEY L. HSU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVINS DEON

Defendant

AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/29/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/29/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Deon Evins on 12/29/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to a lack of prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 04/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Deon Evins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Deon Evins (Plaintiff); As to: AMFP IV Atrium LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Deon Evins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Deon Evins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wesley L. Hsu in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from AMFP IV Atrium LLC. (Defendant) to AMFP IV Atrium LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. is a litigant