This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 10:32:42 (UTC).

DEON EVINS VS AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 DEON EVINS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0935

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVINS DEON

Defendant

AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

10/8/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 09/25/2020

9/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 09/25/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

9/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Remote Appearance Information Packet

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Remote Appearance Information Packet

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/11/2020

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/11/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

6/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/30/2020

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

4/17/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (by Wendy Garcia)

4/6/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (by Wendy Garcia)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

4/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

4/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/9/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/9/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/9/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Deon Evins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 09/25/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Deon Evins on 03/09/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19) scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 09/25/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Remote Appearance Information Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19) scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/11/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial (MASS CONT. RE: COVID-19) scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 02:00 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (MASS CONT. RE: COVID-19) scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (by Wendy Garcia); Filed by: AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Deon Evins (Plaintiff); As to: AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Deon Evins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Deon Evins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Donna Hollingsworth in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. is a litigant