This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 01:06:59 (UTC).

DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFO VS ZAGHI, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 10/29/2015 DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZAGHI, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TONY L. RICHARDSON and MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7811

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TONY L. RICHARDSON

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.

ZAGHI JOSEPH DBA ANGEL DENTAL CARE

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

ZAGHI JOSEPH DBA ANGEL DENTAL CARE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection

9/29/2016: Notice of Rejection

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/21/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($60.00)

12/4/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($60.00)

Service of Claim - Certified Mail Receipt (Small Claims)

12/17/2015: Service of Claim - Certified Mail Receipt (Small Claims)

Request (name extension)

10/29/2015: Request (name extension)

Request for Certified Mail - Electronic

10/29/2015: Request for Certified Mail - Electronic

Request (name extension)

11/13/2015: Request (name extension)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

11/17/2015: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/14/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/3/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order

3/3/2016: Minute Order

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

3/25/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

RETURNED MAIL

3/24/2016: RETURNED MAIL

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - ALH256899035

3/22/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - ALH256899035

RETURNED MAIL

3/24/2016: RETURNED MAIL

Minute Order

4/21/2016: Minute Order

RETURNED MAIL

5/2/2016: RETURNED MAIL

Notice of Rejection

1/9/2017: Notice of Rejection

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Appeal: Filed By Parties changed to (DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.) (Plaintiff) ; As To Parties changed to JOSEPH ZAGHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0008965 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued and Filed by: (DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL RETURNED AS TO (ZAGHI, JOSEPH) DBA (ANGEL DENTAL CARE) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER; INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS; UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 03:38P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. TONY L. RICHARDSON, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT APPEARING. IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 04/21/16 . FOR (DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.) . AGAINST (ZAGHI, JOSEPH) DBA (ANGEL DENTAL CARE) . PRINCIPAL $ 452.95 , COSTS $ 55.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , AND SUPERIOR COURT COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 507.95 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2015
  • COPY OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO PLAINTIFF(S) (DENTAL ARTS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.) . RECEIPT # ALH258280021 . CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT: 70132630000006898788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ZAGHI, JOSEPH) DBA (ANGEL DENTAL CARE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/19/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (ZAGHI, JOSEPH) DBA (ANGEL DENTAL CARE) . RECEIPT # ALH258280020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • REQUEST RE: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (ZAGHI, JOSEPH) DBA (ANGEL DENTAL CARE) . RECEIPT # 115103E1173 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1151030E1173. HEARING SET FOR 01/19/16 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (ZAGHI, JOSEPH) DBA (ANGEL DENTAL CARE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • REQUEST RE: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.