This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 14:59:09 (UTC).

DENISE KISH VS THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY STORE LLC,

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 DENISE KISH filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY STORE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2372

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KISH DENISE

Defendant

THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY STORE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUSTODIO MIGUEL ANGEL JR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/16/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint

10/2/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

10/2/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/2/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Denise Kish (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Denise Kish on 10/02/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Denise Kish as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Denise Kish (Plaintiff); As to: The Donna Karan Company Store LLC, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Denise Kish (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Donna Kara Company Store, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUSTODIO MIGUEL A.