This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 14:06:27 (UTC).

DEMARI WATSON, ET AL. VS PEGGY LEUGUE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 DEMARI WATSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEGGY LEUGUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5828

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATSON DEMARI

Defendants

LEUGUE PEGGY

LEUGUE PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH C.

Defendant Attorney

REPCHAIN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/14/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jeremiah

7/15/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jeremiah

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Antwan

7/15/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Antwan

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/7/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

9/30/2020: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Peggy Leugue (Defendant); Patrick Leugue (Defendant); As to: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Leugue (Defendant); Mailing Date: 07/31/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); As to: Peggy Leugue (Defendant); Service Date: 07/31/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jeremiah; Signed and Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); As to: Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Antwan; Signed and Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); As to: Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); As to: Peggy Leugue (Defendant); Patrick Leugue (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); As to: Peggy Leugue (Defendant); Patrick Leugue (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Antwan: Filed By: Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff),Demari Watson (Plaintiff),Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); As to: Peggy Leugue (Defendant); Patrick Leugue (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jeremiah: Filed By: Jeremiah Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff),Antwan Jamar, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff),Demari Watson (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REPCHIAN DANIEL