This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2020 at 08:00:13 (UTC).

DAWN MARIE VANDERPOOL VS BIG ISLAND, INC. DBA ALONDRA AUTO, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 DAWN MARIE VANDERPOOL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIG ISLAND, INC DBA ALONDRA AUTO, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0396

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDERPOOL DAWN MARIE

Defendants

DBA ALONDRA AUTO INC. BIG ISLAND INC.

COMPANY HUDSON INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

1/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Order (name extension) - Order Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

1/15/2020: Order (name extension) - Order Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling

2/28/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/7/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

5/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion and Motion

5/15/2019: Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion and Motion

Answer - Answer

3/1/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/10/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/10/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/23/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff); As to: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff); Big Island, Inc. dba Alondra Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOrder Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Signed and Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/15/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/15/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continued Plaintiff's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/30/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff); As to: Big Island, Inc. dba Alondra Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff); As to: Big Island, Inc. dba Alondra Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dawn Marie Vanderpool (Plaintiff); As to: Big Island, Inc. dba Alondra Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00396    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 94

Vanderpool v. Big Island, Inc. dba Alondra Auto Inc.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Motion of Attorney Kasra Sadr of the Car Law Firm to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Dawn Marie Vanderpool is GRANTED. ORDER EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE CORRECTED AND SIGNED ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION ON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

Case Number: 19STLC00396    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 94

Vanderpool v. Big Island, Inc., et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Attorney Kasra Sadr, Esq. of The Sadr Law Firm’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Dawn Marie Vanderpool is CONTINUED TO JANUARY 15, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 94. MOVING PARTY IS TO GIVE NOTICE OF THE CONTINUED HEARING TO ALL PARTIES AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE SAME AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE. MOVING PARTY IS ALSO TO FILE A PROPOSED ORDER WITH THE CORRECT TRIAL DATE. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN THE MOTION BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR OR DENIED.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.