Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 03:41:26 (UTC).

DAVIS DIANE VS LOUISIANA FAMOUS FRIED CHICKEN RF, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 DAVIS DIANE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOUISIANA FAMOUS FRIED CHICKEN RF, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0690

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANE DAVIS

Defendants

LOUISIANA FAMOUS FRIED CHICKEN RF INC.

SHABANDRI INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDSON PERRIN

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/24/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/28/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Shabandri Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Louisiana Famous Fried Chicken RF, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Louisiana Famous Fried Chicken RF, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Louisiana Famous Fried Chicken RF, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON PERRIN