This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 17:34:46 (UTC).

DAVIS DIANE VS 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 DAVIS DIANE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4657

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANE DAVIS

Defendant

99 CENT ONLY STORES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDSON PERRIN

Defendant Attorney

STOLL RICHARD G.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/2/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/2/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/2/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Answer - Answer

7/14/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Davis Diane on 06/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Davis Diane as to 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC (Defendant); As to: Davis Diane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Davis Diane (Plaintiff); As to: 99 CENT ONLY STORES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON PERRIN