Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2017 at 12:00:04 (UTC).

DAVIS, ANGEL VS MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2016 DAVIS, ANGEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2458

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS ANGEL

Defendant

MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Writ - Return Wholly satisfied from LASD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Address for ANGEL DAVIS (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0006143 (Waived Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL As to: Davis, Angel - Order on court fee waiver 11/07/16; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: As to: ANGEL DAVIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2016
  • Amended Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Statement of Decision; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: ANGEL DAVIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Address for ANGEL DAVIS (Plaintiff) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/30/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPARTMENT NE2 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 . FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER . HEARING SET FOR 06/30/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (DAVIS, ANGEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (DAVIS, ANGEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC is a litigant