This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 03:13:38 (UTC).

DAVID KITCHEN, ET AL. VS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 DAVID KITCHEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1564

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KITCHEN DAVID

KITCHEN CAROLYN

Defendant

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearing01/19/2021 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: David Kitchen (Plaintiff); Carolyn Kitchen (Plaintiff); As to: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Defendant) to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Defendant) to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less