Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2019 at 12:45:00 (UTC).

DAVID BRUCE GARDNER, ET AL. VS TIN HSIANG CHAI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 DAVID BRUCE GARDNER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TIN HSIANG CHAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4607

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARDNER DAVID BRUCE

TAYLOR KARA NICHOLE

Defendants

INVESERVE CORP

CHAI TIN HSIANG

LIN CHI HSIUNG

LIN LI HSIUNG

CHAI HUI CHEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

12/13/2019: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2019

12/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2019

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/13/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/5/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 12/13/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by David Bruce Gardner, et al. on 11/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: David Bruce Gardner (Plaintiff); As to: Inveserve Corp (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/13/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: David Bruce Gardner (Plaintiff); Kara Nichole Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: Tin Hsiang Chai (Defendant); Hui Chen Chai (Defendant); Chi Hsiung Lin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESERVE INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant