Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 23:22:40 (UTC).

DAVID BOYKOFF VS MARCIN & LAMBIRTH , LLP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 DAVID BOYKOFF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARCIN LAMBIRTH , LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5140

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYKOFF DAVID DBA DAVID BOYKOFF DBA BOYKOFF INVESTIGATIONS

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Defendants

MARCIN & LAMBIRTH LLP AKA JOHN MARCIN

5567 Reseda Blvd. # 200

Tarzana, CA 91356

MARCIN JOHN

Tarzana, CA 91356

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/22/2017

2/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/22/2017

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/22/2016

12/22/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/22/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/22/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/15/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/21/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/27/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

10/27/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/27/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Marcin & Lambirth , LLP (Defendant); John Marcin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 02/22/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 02/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/22/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: David Boykoff (Plaintiff); As to: John Marcin (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1161031E3771 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161031E3771 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: David Boykoff (Plaintiff); As to: Marcin & Lambirth , LLP (Defendant); John Marcin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP is a litigant