This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2019 at 12:28:33 (UTC).

DAVID ADIDA VS RAZER USA LTD.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 DAVID ADIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAZER USA LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3283

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADIDA DAVID

Defendant

RAZER USA LTD.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2019

9/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/11/2019

9/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/11/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/30/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

8/6/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/6/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by David Adida on 08/06/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/25/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/11/2019 09:15 AM at Department S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 09:15 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department S Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/25/2019 08:30 AM at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 09:15 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: David Adida (Plaintiff); As to: Razer USA Ltd. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: David Adida (Plaintiff); As to: Razer USA Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Razer USA is a litigant