This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 02:04:12 (UTC).

DARNELL TAYLOR VS GRACE MATHEW

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 DARNELL TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GRACE MATHEW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4872

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR DARNELL

Defendant

MATHEW GRACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

10/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/15/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing Re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

7/31/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing Re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Motion to be relieved as Counsel)

7/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Motion to be relieved as Counsel)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Motion to be relieved as Counsel) of 07/21/2020

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Motion to be relieved as Counsel) of 07/21/2020

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/7/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/7/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Complaint - Complaint

6/11/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/11/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/11/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Kenneth Yeager (Attorney); As to: Darnell Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/15/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Darnell Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Motion to be relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Motion to be relieved as Counsel) of 07/21/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Kenneth Yeager (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Darnell Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Darnell Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Mathew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Darnell Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Mathew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Darnell Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Mathew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC04872    Hearing Date: October 15, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:   Thu., October 15, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Taylor v. Mathew COMPL. FILED: 06-11-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC04872 DISC. C/O: 11-09-21

NOTICE:   OK DISC. MOT. C/O:    11-24-21

TRIAL DATE: 12-09-21

PROCEEDINGS    MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

MOVING PARTY:   Plaintiff’s Counsel Kenneth C. Yeager

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC rule 3.162)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff’s Counsel Kenneth C. Yeager’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED and the Order will be signed at the hearing. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).) Plaintiff] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of October 9, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of October 9, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On June 11, 2020, Plaintiff Darnell Taylor (“Plaintiff”) filed this action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Grace Mathew (“Defendant”). Defendant has not yet been served.

On July 7, 2020, Plaintiff’s Counsel Kenneth C. Yeager (“Counsel”) filed the instant Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”). No opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

The court may order that an attorney be changed or substituted at any time before or after judgment or final determination upon request by either client or attorney and after notice from one to the other. (Code Civ. Proc. § 284, subd. (2).) “The determination whether to grant or deny a motion to withdraw as counsel lies within the sound discretion of the trial court.” (Manfredi & Levine v. Superior Court (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 1128, 1133.) An application to be relieved as counsel must be made on Judicial Counsel Forms MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subds. (a), (c), (e).)

(B) The service address is the last known residence or business address of the client and the attorney has been unable to locate a more current address after making reasonable efforts to do so within 30 days before the filing of the motion to be relieved.

  1. Discussion

Counsel served this Motion at Plaintiff’s current address, which was confirmed in person with Plaintiff’s mother, Darlene Collier, at most 30 days before filing this Motion. (MC-052, ¶ 3.)

The Court is satisfied with Counsel’s reasons for seeking to be relived and finds that he has satisfied the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subdivisions (a) and (c)-(e). In addition, trial is scheduled for December 9, 2021, giving Plaintiff sufficient time to obtain new counsel should he wish to continue prosecuting this action.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff’s Counsel Kenneth C. Yeager’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED and the Order will be signed at the hearing. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).) Plaintiff] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

Plaintiff’s Counsel is ordered to give notice.